CA AB1174 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-22 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-22 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9882 of, and to add Sections 9882.6 and 9882.7 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to automotive repair.
Title
Automotive Repair Act: violations: regulations: reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1174 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1174 Bonilla By Hill (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1174 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-05 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1174 Bonilla By Hill (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1174 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-05 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6420.). |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 24). |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6006.) |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5106.). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3509.) |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9882 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9882.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9882.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9882.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9882.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9882.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 9889.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 100240 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 100241 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 100242 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 100243 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 137 | Amended Code | Citation Text |