CA AB1173 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 510 of, and to add Section 511.3 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: work hours: holiday season: overtime.
Sponsors
Asm. Matthew Harper [R] | Asm. Travis Allen [R] | Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. John Moorlach [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-11 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 511.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |