CA AB1172 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
Pending: Senate Banking and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 17210 of, and to add Section 17406.0.1 to, the Financial Code, relating to escrow agents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Escrow agents: asset and accounting requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1172 O'Donnell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.)
2021-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19).
2021-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29).
2021-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2021-04-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & F.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Financial Code17210Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code17406.0.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback