CA AB1172 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 514, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 514, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 75470 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 75470) of Part 8 of Division 21 of, and to add Section 74200.5 to, the Water Code, and to add Sections 4.5 and 5.5 to Chapter 819 of the Statutes of 1971, relating to water conservation districts.
Title
Eastern San Joaquin County Water District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1172 GALGIANI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-08 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1172 Galgiani By Wolk (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1172 GALGIANI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-08 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1172 Galgiani By Wolk (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1172 GALGIANI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 514, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-29 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-09 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3179.) | |
2009-09-08 | From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 8). | |
2009-08-31 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2009-08-27 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-08-27 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1974.) | |
2009-07-09 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 8). | |
2009-07-01 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-06-17 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1471.) | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-07 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6). | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |