CA AB1171 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 467, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 26038.1 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: private right of action.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1171 Blanca Rubio Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1171 Blanca Rubio et al. By Becker (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1171 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 467, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-19 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2023-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 5. Page 3309.).
2023-09-12AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.)
2023-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2023-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2578.).
2023-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2023-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
2023-07-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-07-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-06-15SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2023-05-24SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D., JUD. and APPR.
2023-05-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1555.)
2023-05-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2023-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 2).
2023-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2023-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-23AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
2023-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2023-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26038.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback