CA AB1171 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Enrolled on September 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2236.1, 2966, 10186.1, and 11319.2 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 1946.7 and 1946.8 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 1036.2, 1103, and 1107 of the Evidence Code, to amend Sections 3044 and 6930 of the Family Code, to amend Sections 13956 and 53165 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 136.2, 136.7, 209, 261, 261.6, 261.7, 264, 264.1, 264.2, 273.7, 290, 292, 667, 667.5, 667.51, 667.6, 667.61, 667.71, 667.8, 667.9, 679.02, 680, 784.7, 799, 868.5, 1048, 1127e, 1170.12, 1192.5, 1202.1, 1203.055, 1203.06, 1203.066, 1203.067, 1203.075, 1203.08, 1203.09, 1270.1, 1346.1, 1387, 1524.1, 1601, 2933.5, 2962, 3000, 3053.8, 3057, 11105.3, 11160, 12022.3, 12022.53, 12022.8, 12022.85, 13701, 13750, 13837, and 14205 of, and to repeal Section 262 of, the Penal Code, to amend Section 5164 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Section 4467 of the Vehicle Code, and to amend Sections 6500 and 15610.63 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rape of a spouse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-08 - Assembly - AB 1171 Cristina Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1171 Cristina Garcia et a By Eggman (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1171 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2021-09-08AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
2021-09-08AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 42. Noes 13.)
2021-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-02SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 13).
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-06-07SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-06-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 1).
2021-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-27Assembly(pending re-refer to Com. on APPR.)
2021-05-27AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2021-05-27AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 18.)
2021-05-27AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2021-05-20AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Arambula.
2021-05-03AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Arambula.
2021-05-03AssemblyFrom Consent Calendar.
2021-04-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27).
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code10186.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code11319.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2236.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2966Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1946.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1946.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Evidence Code1036.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Evidence Code1103Amended CodeCitation Text
Evidence Code1107Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code3044Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code6930Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13956Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53165Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1048Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code11105.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code11160Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1127Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1170.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1192.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1202.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code12022.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code12022.53Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code12022.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code12022.85Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1203.055Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1203.06Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1203.066Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1203.067Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1203.075Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1203.08Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1203.09Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1270.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1346.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code136.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code136.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13701Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13750Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13837Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1387Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code14205Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1524.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1601Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code209Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code261Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code261.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code261.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code262Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code264Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code264.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code264.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code273.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code290Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code292Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code2933.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code2962Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code3000Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code3053.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code3057Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code667Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code667.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code667.51Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code667.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code667.61Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code667.71Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code667.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code667.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code679.02Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code680Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code784.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code799Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code868.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5164Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code4467Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code15610.63Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code6500Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback