CA AB1165 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 208.4 and 208.6 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile facilities: storage and use of chemical agents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-01AssemblyDied on inactive file.
2022-01-31AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Gipson.
2022-01-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-01-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2022-01-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 20).
2021-05-20AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-05-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2021-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code208.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code208.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback