CA AB1164 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 943, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 943, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6004 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Dams and reservoirs: exclusions: publicly owned or operated regulating basins.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1164 Flora Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1164 Flora By Caballero (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - [Final] hearing set for [06-01-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1164 Flora Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1164 Flora By Caballero (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - [Final] hearing set for [06-01-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1164 Flora Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 943, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 5096.). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1471.) |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12). |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 6004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |