CA AB1163 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 5 (commencing with Section 4560) to Division 4.5 of the Probate Code, relating to minors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minors: power of attorney to care for a minor child.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1163 IRWIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-04SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-09-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-06-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-06-26SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-06-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1939.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-04-17AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-04-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2017-04-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Code6570New CodeSee Bill Text
Probate Code4560New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code10912Repealed CodeCitation Text
Water Code10912.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback