CA AB1162 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 38567 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: Low-Carbon Fuel Standard regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1162 BOCANEGRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2018-06-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-14SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-06-14SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-06-14SenateFrom inactive file.
2017-08-24SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
2017-06-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1386.)
2017-05-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 2).
2017-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code7031.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code38567New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code108Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback