CA AB1160 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 38750 of the Vehicle Code, relating to autonomous vehicles.
Title
Autonomous vehicles.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1160 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1791.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and C. & C. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 38750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |