CA AB116 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65961 of, and to add Section 66452.24 to, the Government Code, relating to land use, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Land use: subdivision maps: expiration dates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB116 Bocanegra Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - AB 116 BOCANEGRA Third Reading Urgency (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - AB 116 BOCANEGRA Third Reading Urgency (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-07-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:20 a.m. |
2013-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1600.). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1509.). |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1453.) |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2013-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65961 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 66452.24 | New Code | See Bill Text |