CA AB1159 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 358, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 358, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 38561.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: natural and working lands: market-based compliance mechanisms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-28 - Assembly - AB 1159 Aguiar-Curry Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-08-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1159 Aguiar-Curry (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1159 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1159 Aguiar-Curry (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1159 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 358, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled measure version corrected. |
2023-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2823.). |
2023-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2180.). |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and N.R. & W. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1902.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38561.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |