CA AB1158 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21183 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Jobs and Economic Improvement Through Environmental
Sponsors
Asm. Nora Campos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. & E. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21183 | Amended Code | Citation Text |