CA AB1158 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-30 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-30 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23035 of the Financial Code, relating to deferred deposit transactions.
Title
Deferred deposit transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1158 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1158 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | |
2011-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 16. Page 1696.) | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-22 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2011-03-21 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 14001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 23035 | Amended Code | Citation Text |