CA AB1157 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1367.005 of, and to add Section 1342.9 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10112.27 of, and to add Section 10112.275 to, the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rehabilitative and habilitative services: durable medical equipment and services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1157 Ortega Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-01SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2023-08-14SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
2023-07-20SenateMeasure version as amended on July 13 corrected.
2023-07-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-07-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 12).
2023-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 2050.)
2023-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 18).
2023-05-18AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
2023-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2023-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2023-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1342.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1367.005Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10112.27Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10112.275New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback