CA AB1157 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 205, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 99243 and 99243.5 of the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Section 2103 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controller: transportation funds: distribution and reporting requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1157 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1157 Lee Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-22 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 205, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-22 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-07 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-06-30SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-05-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-04-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1252.)
2021-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21).
2021-04-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback