CA AB1157 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 440, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 440, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 401.17, 441, and 1153.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Property taxation: certificated aircraft assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1157 Nazarian By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1157 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1157 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 440, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2690.). |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 1548.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 13). |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 27). |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 1153.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 401.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 441 | Amended Code | Citation Text |