CA AB1151 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2023 to the Fish and Game Code, relating to marine life.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vaquita-friendly fish and fish products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1151 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-12SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2017-07-10SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 1966.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
2017-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-04AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code2023New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback