CA AB1149 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 271, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 25503.2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages: tied-house restrictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 1149 Villapudua Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1149 Villapudua Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1149 Villapudua Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 271, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-23 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-08 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2021-09-01AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
2021-09-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.)
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-06-30SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2021-06-03SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2021-05-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12).
2021-04-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-28AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 22).
2021-04-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2021-04-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code25503.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback