CA AB1146 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Article 11 (commencing with Section 12100.210) of Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to rent forgiveness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Small Business Rent Relief Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2022-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2022-01-20AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2022-01-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-01-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2022-01-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2021-04-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2021-04-14AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 13).
2021-04-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
2021-04-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on J.,E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12100.210Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback