CA AB1146 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 751, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 751, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1798.105 and 1798.145 of the Civil Code, relating to privacy.
Title
California Consumer Privacy Act of 2018: exemptions: vehicle information.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1146 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1146lass="statusCell"> (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1146 Berman By Wieckowski (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1146 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1146lass="statusCell"> (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1146 Berman By Wieckowski (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1146 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 751, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3511.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2820.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1853.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.145 | Amended Code | Citation Text |