CA AB1142 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65080 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 5440 of, and to add Section 5451 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Regional transportation plans: transportation network companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1142 Friedman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1142 Friedman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 9). |
2019-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1260.) |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65080 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5440 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5451 | New Code | See Bill Text |