CA AB1138 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 564, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 67386 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary education: sexual assault and sexual violence prevention: medical examinations transportation services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1138 Weber Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1138 Weber et al. By Limón (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1138 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 564, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-21 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2023-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3424.).
2023-09-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2023-09-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2665.).
2023-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2023-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2023-07-03SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
2023-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2023-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2023-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1928.)
2023-05-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2023-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18).
2023-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2023-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-13AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2023-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 11).
2023-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2023-03-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2023-03-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2023-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2023-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code67386Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1138
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1138#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1138#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1138#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1138#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1138#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1138#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1138#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1138#92AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1138#91ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1138#90CHP
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1138

Bill Comments

feedback