CA AB1133 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 25600.05 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beer: premiums, gifts, and free goods.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1133 Low Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1133 Low By Portantino (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1133 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1.).
2019-09-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2019-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-09-05SenateOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-04SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-07-08SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2019-05-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 2046.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code25600.05New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback