CA AB1132 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 171, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 42451.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to nonvehicular air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonvehicular air pollution: order for abatement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-20 - Assembly - AB 1132 GARCIA, C. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1132 Cristina Garcia By Lara (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1132 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 171, Statutes of 2017.
2017-08-07 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-31AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2017-07-20AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 2639.).
2017-07-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-07-17SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2077.).
2017-07-10SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-06SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 5).
2017-06-21SenateIn committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. Read second time and amended.
2017-06-01SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2017-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 13. Page 1639.)
2017-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-01AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2017-05-01AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-04-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 17).
2017-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code42451.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback