CA AB1131 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 109.51 (commencing with Section 130260) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health information.
Title
Health information network.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 130260 | New Code | See Bill Text |