CA AB113 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 65585 and 65589.11 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 50515.02 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 113 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-13SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (September 10).
2019-09-09SenateSenate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2690.)
2019-09-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-08-30SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-08-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-08-26SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-04-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1184.)
2019-04-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-04AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-04AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-04-04AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.)
2019-01-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2018-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65585Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65589.11Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50515.02Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback