CA AB1129 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1797.227 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services.
Title
Emergency medical services: data and information system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-01 - Assembly - AB 1129 BURKE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1129 Burke By Nguyen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 1129 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1129 Burke By Nguyen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 1129 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2742.). |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2298.). |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1330.) |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1256.) |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1797.225 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.227 | New Code | See Bill Text |