CA AB1128 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1417, 1417.1, 1417.2, 1417.3, 1417.5, 1417.6, 1417.7, and 1417.9 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal cases: exhibits: retention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1417 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1417.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1417.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1417.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1417.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1417.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1417.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1417.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1417.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |