CA AB1127 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 667 and 1170.12 of, and to add Section 1170.96 to, the Penal Code, relating to serious or violent felonies.
Title
Serious or violent felonies: enhancements: juveniles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Santiago. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 27). |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1170.96 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 667 | Amended Code | Citation Text |