CA AB1127 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 781, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 46600 of the Education Code, relating to pupil attendance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interdistrict attendance: prohibition on transfers by a school district of residence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Senate - Special Consent AB1127 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1127 Luz Rivas Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 781, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-17AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2713.).
2019-09-04SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-06-24SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1591.)
2019-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2019-03-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code46600Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback