CA AB1127 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Sections 756 and 756.5 of the Evidence Code and Section 68567 of the Government Code, relating to legal services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legal aid: court interpreters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1127 Chau By Lara (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1127 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1127 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-06 Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
2014-01-06 Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2013-10-12 Vetoed by Governor.
2013-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2013-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3227.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 3238.).
2013-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 2334.).
2013-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-09-03SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2013-08-13SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2013-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2013-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 1817.)
2013-05-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-05-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-05-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2013-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 30).
2013-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2013-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2013-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2013-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Evidence Code756Repealed CodeCitation Text
Evidence Code756.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code68567New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1127&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_bill_20130222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_bill_20130321_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_bill_20130502_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_bill_20130524_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_bill_20130903_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_bill_20130906_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_bill_20130918_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_vote_20130430_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_vote_20130524_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_vote_20130530_0233PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_vote_20130625_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_vote_20130812_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_vote_20130830_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_vote_20130911_0623PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_vote_20130911_1146AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback