CA AB1127 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 17074.50, 17074.52, and 17074.56 of the Education Code, relating to school facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School facilities: automatic fire sprinkler system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2010-01-31 Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2009-05-28 In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
2009-05-13 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2009-04-30 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-29 Read second time and amended.
2009-04-28 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 22).
2009-04-16 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2009-03-26 Referred to Com. on ED.
2009-03-02 Read first time.
2009-03-01 From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2009-02-27 Introduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback