CA AB1126 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 112, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 112, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6025.4 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to pesticides.
Title
Pesticides: carbon monoxide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - Assembly - AB 1126 AGRI. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By CABALLERO (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1126 AGRI (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Assembly - AB 1126 AGRI. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1126 AGRI (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Assembly - AB 1126 AGRI. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 112, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2469.). |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1845.). |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and EQ. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 844.) |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 22). |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 6025.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |