CA AB1125 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 356, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1803 and 40508 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Code: infractions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1125 Hart Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1125 Hart By Limón (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Assembly - AB 1125 Hart Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 356, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2023-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3194.).
2023-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2023-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2482.).
2023-06-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-06-15SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-06-08SenateOrdered to third reading.
2023-06-08SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2023-06-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 6).
2023-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on PUB S.
2023-05-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1412.)
2023-04-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2023-03-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2023-03-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2023-03-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-02AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S.
2023-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2023-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code1803Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code40508Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback