CA AB1125 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 622, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 622, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 20.5 (commencing with Section 26220) to Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Animal Control Officer Standards Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1125 Cooley Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1125 Cooley By Archuleta (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1125 Cooley Assembly Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1125 Cooley By Archuleta (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1125 Cooley Assembly Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 622, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 3384.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2778.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 8). |
2019-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and B., P. & E.D. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 2150.) |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 2149.) |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 2064.) |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 26220 | New Code | See Bill Text |