CA AB1123 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal Section 107 of the Corporations Code, and to add Section 2178 to, and to add Division 11 (commencing with Section 26000) to, the Financial Code, relating to currency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virtual currency: regulation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2018-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2017-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2017-03-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & F.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Corporations Code107Repealed CodeCitation Text
Financial Code14002Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code2178New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback