CA AB1123 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 467.15 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to dispute resolution.
Title
Dispute resolution programs: court administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Mayes. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 467.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |