CA AB1120 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 685, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 685, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1246 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to clinical laboratories.
Title
Clinical laboratories: blood withdrawal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1120 Irwin Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1120 Irwin By Dodd (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1120 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1120 Irwin By Dodd (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1120 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 685, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 7.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5098.). |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 2. Page 3404.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 20). |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1246 | Amended Code | Citation Text |