CA AB1119 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12920, 12921, 12926, and 12940 of the Government Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment discrimination.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 20). |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12920 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |