CA AB1117 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21005, 21080, 21091, 21167.6, 21168.5, 21168.9, and 21177 of, and to add Sections 21166.5 and 21175 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21080 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21166.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21167.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21168.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21168.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21175 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21177 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1117 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1117 |