CA AB1117 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 6.3 (commencing with Section 14197) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to vaccinations.
Title
Medi-Cal: vaccination rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1117 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1117 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 12. Page 1875.) |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 28). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197 | New Code | See Bill Text |