CA AB1117 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 136, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 136, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11770 of the Insurance Code, relating to the State Compensation Insurance Fund, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State Compensation Insurance Fund: board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-16 - Assembly - AB 1117 FUENTES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-09 - Senate - Special Consent #12 AB1117 Fuentes (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1117 FUENTES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-09 - Senate - Special Consent #12 AB1117 Fuentes (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1117 FUENTES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 136, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-07-30 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2009-07-16 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2542.) | |
2009-07-09 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-07-09 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1664.) | |
2009-07-02 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-28 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2009-06-26 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2009-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1466.) | |
2009-05-07 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-06 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6). | |
2009-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2009-04-13 | Referred to Com. on INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |