CA AB1112 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8203.6 to the Education Code, relating to before and after school programs, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Before and after school programs: cost study and advisory group.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1112 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1112 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1337.). |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7). |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8203.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |