CA AB1112 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Division 16.8 (commencing with Section 39050) to the Vehicle Code, relating to shared mobility devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shared mobility devices: local regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1112 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-06-19SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-11SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Coms. on TRANS., GOV. & F. and JUD.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1779.)
2019-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-07AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30).
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-04-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code39050New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback