CA AB1110 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-09 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Robert Rivas.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-09 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Robert Rivas.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 63048.92 and 63048.93 of, to add Chapter 14 (commencing with Section 14990) to Part 5.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, and to add and repeal Article 8.5 (commencing with Section 12100.87) of Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to climate catalyst projects.
Title
Zero-emission vehicles: Clean Vehicles Ombudsperson: Climate Catalyst Revolving Loan Fund Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Rivas [D] | Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Senate - Special Consent AB1110 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1110 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1110 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Robert Rivas. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2490.). |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 6). |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and G.O. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1825.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J.,E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12100.87 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14990 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 63048.92 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63048.93 | Amended Code | Citation Text |