CA AB1110 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 595, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 827 of the Civil Code, relating to rent increases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rent increases: noticing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1110 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Ass (Y: 7 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1110 Friedman By Portantino (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Bill Votes (Y: 9 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1110 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 595, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-19AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 16. Page 3281.).
2019-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2678.).
2019-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-04SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-06-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 18).
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 1777.)
2019-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 30).
2019-03-28AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code827Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback