CA AB1110 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 656, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 656, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 398.1, 398.2, 398.4, and 398.5 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Greenhouse gases emissions intensity reporting: retail electricity suppliers.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1110 TING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1110 Ting By Wolk (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1110 TING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1110 Ting By Wolk (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1110 TING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 656, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 6529.). |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 30). |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6328.) |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5307.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wolk. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27). |
2015-08-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 13). |
2015-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1389.) |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 398.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 398.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 398.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 398.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 4115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |