CA AB1110 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 366.1, 366.3, 391, and 13754 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Dependent children of the juvenile court: county
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-27 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2011-05-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-16 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-10 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3). | |
2011-05-02 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-04-28 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 13754 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 391 | Amended Code | Citation Text |